OH HB215 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-4)
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-05 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-05 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 5747.08 and 5747.98 and to enact sections 3313.94 and 5747.64 of the Revised Code to authorize a board of education or governing authority of a school to enter into an agreement with a volunteer who is a current or retired law enforcement officer to patrol school premises to prevent or respond to a mass casualty event, to generally provide to a board of education or governing authority of a school and to such a volunteer immunity from civil liability for injury, death, or loss arising from the volunteer's services, and to provide a tax credit for volunteer service.
Title
To authorize a board of education or governing authority of a school to enter into an agreement with a volunteer who is a current or retired law enforcement officer to patrol school premises to prevent or respond to a mass casualty event, to generally provide to a board of education or governing authority of a school and to such a volunteer immunity from civil liability for injury, death, or loss arising from the volunteer's services, and to provide a tax credit for volunteer service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-04 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-05 | To Finance | |
2013-12-05 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-11-07 | Committee Report | |
2013-06-19 | To Education | |
2013-06-19 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
33 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 13 | 94 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 64 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 47 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |