OH HB195 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 58-31)
Status: Passed on August 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-01 - Effective 8/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 58-31)
Status: Passed on August 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-01 - Effective 8/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4766.01, 4766.04, and 4766.09 of the Revised Code to modify the law governing the transport of persons who require the use of a wheelchair or other mobility aid in nonemergency circumstances.
Title
Modify law regarding transport of people requiring mobility aid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-01 | Effective 8/1/18 | |
2018-04-11 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-06-21 | House | Passed |
2017-05-25 | House | Reported - Amended: Transportation and Public Safety |
2017-05-09 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |
2017-05-01 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 66 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 66 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 66 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |