NY S08617 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the state energy planning board to conduct a study on time frames for replacing or upgrading battery energy storage systems at renewable energy facilities in preparation for clean energy storage and distribution across the state.
Title
Directs the state energy planning board to conduct a study on time frames for replacing or upgrading battery energy storage systems at renewable energy facilities in preparation for clean energy storage and distribution across the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
2024-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1181 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |