NY S08300 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - LINE VETO MEMO.1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - LINE VETO MEMO.1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Operations Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Operations Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | LINE VETO MEMO.1 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.50 |
2024-04-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-04-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-04-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-04-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.38 |
2024-04-19 | Assembly | substituted for a8800d |
2024-04-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-04-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-04-19 | Senate | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE |
2024-04-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.848 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8300D |
2024-04-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-04-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8300C |
2024-04-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-03-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8300B |
2024-03-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-02-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8300A |
2024-02-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08800 (Same As) 2024-04-19 - substituted by s8300d