NY S07825 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the amount of rent increases for residential ground lease cooperative apartment buildings; establishes certain rights upon the expiration of such leases.
Title
Limits the amount of rent increases for residential ground lease cooperative apartment buildings; establishes certain rights upon the expiration of such leases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.719 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-12-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A05031 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to housing