NY S07744 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires retailers to affix a notice on any bicycles with electric assist and micromobility devices which states to always yield to pedestrians and follow traffic laws that you cannot use such device on sidewalks or on highways, except where allowed by local law; authorizes the department of state to promulgate necessary rules and regulations; imposes fines for violations thereof; makes related provisions.
Title
Requires retailers to affix a notice on any bicycles with electric assist and micromobility devices which states to always yield to pedestrians and follow traffic laws that you cannot use such device on sidewalks or on highways, except where allowed by local law; authorizes the department of state to promulgate necessary rules and regulations; imposes fines for violations thereof; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Iwen Chu [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2024-06-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-03 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2024-05-28 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7744D |
2024-05-28 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-05-28 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2024-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1078 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7744C |
2024-05-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2023-11-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7744B |
2023-11-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2023-11-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7744A |
2023-11-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2023-11-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08310 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - ordered to third reading rules cal.255