NY S07690 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - SIGNED CHAP.349
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - SIGNED CHAP.349
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants the Nyack joint fire district local development corporation and the Nyack general fire protection company, Inc. legal corporate status as not-for-profit corporations.
Title
Grants the Nyack joint fire district local development corporation and the Nyack general fire protection company, Inc. legal corporate status as not-for-profit corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.349 |
2014-08-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.504 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9974a |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1356 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7690A |
2014-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09974 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7690a