NY S07633 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the building inspector and code enforcement officer of the town of Conklin, in the county of Broome, need not be a resident of such town, so long as he or she resides in such county.
Title
Provides that the building inspector and code enforcement officer of the town of Conklin, in the county of Broome, need not be a resident of such town, so long as he or she resides in such county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.177 |
2014-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.512 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a10081 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-06-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1175 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10081 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7633