NY S07225 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes mentally disabled as among those veterans qualified to hold licenses granted under section 35-a of the general business law.
Title
Includes mentally disabled as among those veterans qualified to hold licenses granted under section 35-a of the general business law.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Ball [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1013 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A09304 (Same As) 2014-04-08 - referred to veterans' affairs