NY S07187 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to voting rights.
Title
Relates to voting rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-04 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-06-14 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-06-02 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2023-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |