NY S07138 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - SIGNED CHAP.346
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - SIGNED CHAP.346
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Jefferson county correctional facility.
Title
Relates to the Jefferson county correctional facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.346 |
2014-08-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.738 |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | substituted for a9520 |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2014-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.777 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09520 (Same As) 2014-05-29 - substituted by s7138