NY S07049 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain crimes related to the operation of a motor vehicle; establishes the crimes of persistent aggravated unlicensed operation of a motor vehicle and persistent driving while intoxicated.
Title
Relates to certain crimes related to the operation of a motor vehicle; establishes the crimes of persistent aggravated unlicensed operation of a motor vehicle and persistent driving while intoxicated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.474 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |