NY S07047 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the growing of industrial hemp as part of an agricultural pilot program.
Title
Authorizes the growing of industrial hemp as part of an agricultural pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. John Sampson [D] |
Sen. Cecilia Tkaczyk [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.24 |
2014-12-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.524 |
2014-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.188 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a9140 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1265 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-04-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A09140 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - substituted by s7047