NY S06694 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.152
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.152
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Smithtown, county of Suffolk to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parkland and to acquire other parcels of land to replace such parkland.
Title
Authorizes the town of Smithtown, county of Suffolk to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parkland and to acquire other parcels of land to replace such parkland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.152 |
2014-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.158 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a8400b |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1118 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-03-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6694B |
2014-03-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-03-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6694A |
2014-03-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08400 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - substituted by s6694b