NY S06449 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.413
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.413
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires pharmacies to contact a patient or the patient's caregiver before delivering prescriptions.
Title
Requires pharmacies to contact a patient or the patient's caregiver before delivering prescriptions.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.413 |
2014-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.704 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | substituted for a8612a |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1340 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6449A |
2014-05-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08612 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - substituted by s6449a