NY S06174 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.382
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.382
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the lease and conveyance of certain waterfront park land in the village of Saugerties to Arm of the Sea Productions, Inc.
Title
Authorizes the lease and conveyance of certain waterfront park land in the village of Saugerties to Arm of the Sea Productions, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.382 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.458 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a8622 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-12 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1339 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08622 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6174