NY S06148 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - PRINT NUMBER 6148A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - PRINT NUMBER 6148A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state school resource officer program; provides for grants for school resource officers (Part A); relates to peace officers who are retired police officers employed by a school district as a school resource officer (Part B); allows retired police officers to be employed by a school district as a school safety officer, school security officer or any other substantially similar position for an annual salary of $50,000 or less to continue to receive their full retirement benefit (Part C).
Title
Establishes the New York state school resource officer program; provides for grants for school resource officers (Part A); relates to peace officers who are retired police officers employed by a school district as a school resource officer (Part B); allows retired police officers to be employed by a school district as a school safety officer, school security officer or any other substantially similar position for an annual salary of $50,000 or less to continue to receive their full retirement benefit (Part C).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6148A |
2024-02-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2023-03-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06453 (Same As) 2024-02-29 - print number 6453a