NY S05928 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages participation by minority and women-owned business enterprises in housing, urban renewal and urban development action area project contracts.
Title
Encourages participation by minority and women-owned business enterprises in housing, urban renewal and urban development action area project contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.461 |
2014-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.817 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a8169a |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2014-05-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-04-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.379 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2013-08-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08169 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - substituted by s5928