NY S05552 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.381
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.381
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to local product procurement and a procurement training program for agricultural business.
Title
Relates to local product procurement and a procurement training program for agricultural business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.381 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.544 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7572a |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1078 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5552B |
2014-05-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2014-05-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2013-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1366 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5552A |
2013-05-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2013-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A07572 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s5552b