NY S04918 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8248
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8248
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the payment of capitated rates for services provided by assisted living programs, whether free-standing or not.
Title
Provides for the payment of capitated rates for services provided by assisted living programs, whether free-standing or not.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8248 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1387 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4918A |
2011-06-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2011-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08248 (Same As) 2011-09-23 - tabled