NY S04888 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.558
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.558
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the New York city employees' retirement system to consider the application for disability retirement benefits from Peter DiMario.
Title
Authorizes the New York city employees' retirement system to consider the application for disability retirement benefits from Peter DiMario.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.558 |
2014-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.542 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7140a |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.987 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4888A |
2014-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2013-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1352 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07140 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s4888a