NY S04530 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an intensive addiction and medical services integrated services pilot program to support two three-year demonstration programs that provide intensive addiction and medical services integrated services to individuals who have significant addiction and medical issues.
Title
Establishes an intensive addiction and medical services integrated services pilot program to support two three-year demonstration programs that provide intensive addiction and medical services integrated services to individuals who have significant addiction and medical issues.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Jeremy Cooney [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Robert Rolison [R] |
Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism And Substance Use Disorders Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism And Substance Use Disorders Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2024-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.666 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS |
2023-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS |
Same As/Similar To
A03378 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse