NY S04467 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the standard for disparate treatment claims by defining the terms "because of", "because", "by reason of", and "motivating factor" for the purposes of disparate treatment cases.
Title
Clarifies the standard for disparate treatment claims by defining the terms "because of", "because", "by reason of", and "motivating factor" for the purposes of disparate treatment cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.705 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4467B |
2023-03-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.487 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4467A |
2023-02-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01396 (Same As) 2024-04-10 - print number 1396a