NY S03502 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires inter-agency records prepared by an outside consultant at the behest of an agency to be subject to FOIL disclosure unless such records are otherwise exempted from disclosure.
Title
Requires inter-agency records prepared by an outside consultant at the behest of an agency to be subject to FOIL disclosure unless such records are otherwise exempted from disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.704 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-05-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3502A |
2023-05-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06103 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental operations