NY S02422 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - PRINT NUMBER 2422B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - PRINT NUMBER 2422B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing speed limits in cities with populations in excess of one million people by easing restrictions so cities can establish speed limits below twenty miles per hour.
Title
Relates to establishing speed limits in cities with populations in excess of one million people by easing restrictions so cities can establish speed limits below twenty miles per hour.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2422B |
2024-02-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2023-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-06 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-05-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2422A |
2023-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.271 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07266 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - print number 7266a