NY S02210 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes students to carry prescribed auto-injectable epinephrine in school.
Title
Authorizes students to carry prescribed auto-injectable epinephrine in school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to education |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1545 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-10 | Senate | AMENDED 2210B |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.964 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2210A |
2013-03-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2013-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02566 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to education