NY S00016 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the appropriate rent control agency or administrative agency or supervising agency to send a notice of required renewal to each head of household currently receiving an exemption under the SCRIE program 30 days prior to the application renewal date.
Title
Requires the appropriate rent control agency or administrative agency or supervising agency to send a notice of required renewal to each head of household currently receiving an exemption under the SCRIE program 30 days prior to the application renewal date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. John Sampson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2013-04-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 16A |
2013-04-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2013-04-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A00350 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - REFERRED TO AGING