NY A10144 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-09 - signed chap.248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-09 - signed chap.248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of New York to establish reduced speed limits throughout the city and on certain designated highways.
Title
Authorizes the city of New York to establish reduced speed limits throughout the city and on certain designated highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-09 | Senate | signed chap.248 |
2014-08-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1657 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7892 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | message of necessity - 3 day message |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.584 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.584 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07892 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10144