NY A10131 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - approval memo.4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - approval memo.4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Lockport, in the county of Niagara, to finance a certain deficit by the issuance of bonds.
Title
Authorizes the city of Lockport, in the county of Niagara, to finance a certain deficit by the issuance of bonds.
Sponsors
Asm. Jane Corwin [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | Senate | approval memo.4 |
2014-09-04 | Senate | signed chap.332 |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1552 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7874 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.580 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.580 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07874 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10131