NY A10108 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.285
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.285
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the New York city school construction authority to obtain certain demographic data and utilize such data in connection with the authority's five-year educational facilities capital plan; requires consideration of student demographic data in connection with approval of five-year educational facilities capital plans; requires the publication of findings and commentary on such plan.
Title
Authorizes the New York city school construction authority to obtain certain demographic data and utilize such data in connection with the authority's five-year educational facilities capital plan; requires consideration of student demographic data in connection with approval of five-year educational facilities capital plans; requires the publication of findings and commentary on such plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | signed chap.285 |
2014-08-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1584 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7873 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.430 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.430 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-13 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07873 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10108