NY A10094 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to payments to rural hospitals that are critical access hospitals.
Title
Relates to payments to rural hospitals that are critical access hospitals.
Sponsors
Asm. Addie Jenne [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R] |
Asm. Andrew Goodell [R] | Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Senate | tabled |
2012-08-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.148 |
2012-08-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1537 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 10094b |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.238 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.238 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-05-16 | Assembly | print number 10094a |
2012-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2012-05-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07371 (Same As) 2012-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 7371B