NY A09902 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - substituted by s7351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - substituted by s7351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the threshold amount which triggers the publication requirement of procurement opportunities.
Title
Increases the threshold amount which triggers the publication requirement of procurement opportunities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s7351 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.229 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.229 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07351 (Same As) 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.173