NY A09798 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-14 - substituted by s6873
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-14 - substituted by s6873
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization for the county of Herkimer to impose a county recording tax on obligation secured by a mortgage on real property until 2014.
Title
Extends the authorization for the county of Herkimer to impose a county recording tax on obligation secured by a mortgage on real property until 2014.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s6873 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.214 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-04-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06873 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.234