NY A09636 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - ordered to third reading rules cal.411
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - ordered to third reading rules cal.411
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a banking development district working group to assess the banking development district program and provide an annual report to the governor and legislature on the strengths and weaknesses of such program; defines unbanked and underbanked.
Title
Creates a banking development district working group to assess the banking development district program and provide an annual report to the governor and legislature on the strengths and weaknesses of such program; defines unbanked and underbanked.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.411 |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | rules report cal.411 |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-17 | Assembly | print number 9636a |
2024-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S08147 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - referred to ways and means