NY A09493 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows employees who are involuntarily transferred to a different promotion unit the right to remain on the promotion eligible list from which they were involuntarily transferred.
Title
Allows employees who are involuntarily transferred to a different promotion unit the right to remain on the promotion eligible list from which they were involuntarily transferred.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | tabled |
2014-11-21 | Senate | vetoed memo.504 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.994 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7274 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.862 |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07274 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9493