NY A09452 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-29 - substituted by s6983a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-29 - substituted by s6983a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage weakfish.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage weakfish.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | Assembly | substituted by s6983a |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.736 |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06983 (Same As) 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.161