NY A09379 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the city of Syracuse to adopt ordinances regulating the registration and licensing of limousines and livery vehicles.
Title
Allows the city of Syracuse to adopt ordinances regulating the registration and licensing of limousines and livery vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.303 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.303 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | print number 9379a |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07296 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES