NY A09209 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - substituted by s8440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - substituted by s8440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain payments to the horsemen's organization; extends such provisions to 2025.
Title
Relates to certain payments to the horsemen's organization; extends such provisions to 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Assembly | substituted by s8440 |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.413 |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | reported |
2024-03-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S08440 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - returned to senate