NY A09006 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-03 - signed chap.331
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-03 - signed chap.331
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the expedited missing persons' identification act.
Title
Enacts the expedited missing persons' identification act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-03 | Senate | signed chap.331 |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1470 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6750 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.545 |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06750 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9006