NY A08984 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - print number 8984a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - print number 8984a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts fire departments from consolidation or dissolution.
Title
Exempts fire departments from consolidation or dissolution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | print number 8984a | |
2010-03-10 | amend (t) and recommit to local governments | |
2010-01-06 | referred to local governments | |
2009-06-17 | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08012 (Same As) 2010-05-28 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT