NY A08960 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes bias-related graffiti in hate crimes.
Title
Includes bias-related graffiti in hate crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | print number 8960a |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00951 (Same As) 2014-05-12 - referred to codes