NY A08900 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-27 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-27 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides small businesses with grants of up to $100,000 to commercialize energy and environmental technology innovations and ideas in-state to stimulate economic development.
Title
Provides small businesses with grants of up to $100,000 to commercialize energy and environmental technology innovations and ideas in-state to stimulate economic development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.709 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | print number 8900a |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | referred to small business |