NY A08842 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the name and purpose of the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of Valhalla, New York; provides that any firefighter who has been removed for cause, expelled or dropped from the rolls of such fire department and who has not been reinstated, shall not be eligible in such corporation; relates to the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by such association.
Title
Relates to the name and purpose of the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of Valhalla, New York; provides that any firefighter who has been removed for cause, expelled or dropped from the rolls of such fire department and who has not been reinstated, shall not be eligible in such corporation; relates to the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by such association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-10 | Assembly | print number 8842a |
2024-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | referred to local governments |