NY A08324 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - approval memo.6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - approval memo.6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a residential investment exemption in cities with a population of at least thirteen thousand five hundred and not more than fourteen thousand for improvements to residential real property of at least thirty thousand dollars.
Title
Provides a residential investment exemption in cities with a population of at least thirteen thousand five hundred and not more than fourteen thousand for improvements to residential real property of at least thirty thousand dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-21 | Senate | approval memo.6 |
2014-10-21 | Senate | signed chap.405 |
2014-10-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.885 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5991A |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.821 |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | print number 8324a |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2013-12-18 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05991 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8324A