NY A08319 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Passed on December 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-06 - signed chap.660
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Passed on December 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-06 - signed chap.660
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds telephone numbers to a do-not-call list at the outset of certain telemarketing calls.
Title
Adds telephone numbers to a do-not-call list at the outset of certain telemarketing calls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-06 | Assembly | signed chap.660 |
2022-12-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1371 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8450B |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8319c |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.547 |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-12 | Assembly | print number 8319b |
2022-04-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | print number 8319a |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S08450 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8319C