NY A08142 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale, offer for sale, or distribution of polystyrene foam docks, buoys and floating structures in the state.
Title
Prohibits the sale, offer for sale, or distribution of polystyrene foam docks, buoys and floating structures in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-05-10 | Assembly | print number 8142a |
2024-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-10-13 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07977 (Same As) 2024-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION