NY A07976 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - reference changed to ways and means
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - reference changed to ways and means
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires southeast Queens to mitigate property damage caused by environmental issues which are caused by acts or omissions of such municipality.
Title
Requires southeast Queens to mitigate property damage caused by environmental issues which are caused by acts or omissions of such municipality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | print number 7976a |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | committed to environmental conservation |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.394 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.568 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.568 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04035 (Same As) 2014-03-27 - PRINT NUMBER 4035A