NY A07956 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the village of Gainesville as the "T Sgt Walter Shearing Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the village of Gainesville as the "T Sgt Walter Shearing Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-10 | Assembly | print number 7956a |
2024-05-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2023-08-18 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08338 (Same As) 2024-05-15 - PRINT NUMBER 8338A