NY A07742 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-19 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-19 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the designation of technology development centers and to provide funding for such centers.
Title
Relates to the designation of technology development centers and to provide funding for such centers.
Sponsors
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] | Asm. Joseph Morelle [D] | Asm. William Magnarelli [D] |
Asm. Dennis Gabryszak [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-19 | Senate | tabled |
2011-08-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.38 |
2011-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1394 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5570 |
2011-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.193 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.193 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-06-02 | Assembly | print number 7742a |
2011-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S05570 (Same As) 2011-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7742A