NY A07345 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - ordered to third reading rules cal.260
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - ordered to third reading rules cal.260
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the opt in program for reporting of suspected financial exploitation.
Title
Establishes the opt in program for reporting of suspected financial exploitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.260 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.260 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | committed to aging |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.352 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.158 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.158 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | print number 7345b |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | print number 7345a |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S06927 (Same As) 2014-05-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE